VA SB1083 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Herndon. Amends the town's boundary description.
Title
Charter; Town of Herndon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 570 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1083ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102379D |