VA SB1081 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Intentional tripping of equines prohibited; penalty. Prohibits the intentional roping of or interference with the legs of an equine in order to cause it to trip or fall for the purpose of engagement in a rodeo or other contest or entertainment. The bill exempts from the prohibition such actions that are in the practice of accepted animal husbandry or for the purpose of allowing the administration of veterinary care. The bill makes a violation of the ban a Class 1 misdemeanor, with a second or subsequent violation constituting a Class 6 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equines; prohibits intentional roping of or interference with the legs of an equine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 9-N 1-A) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
2015-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 491 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15
2015-02-23SenateSigned by President
2015-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1081ER)
2015-02-20SenateEnrolled
2015-02-17SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 9-N 1-A)
2015-02-13HousePassed House with amendments (84-Y 9-N 1-A)
2015-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2015-02-13HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2015-02-13HouseRead third time
2015-02-12HouseRead second time
2015-02-11HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 3-N)
2015-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2015-01-30HouseRead first time
2015-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2015-01-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1081S1
2015-01-27SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 15104007D-S1
2015-01-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2015-01-27SenateRead second time
2015-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2015-01-22SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2015-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 15104007D-S1
2015-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2015-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101331D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326570(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+SB1081
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1081+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1081S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1081ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0491+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S01V0015+SB1081
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0099SB1081+SB1081
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0142SB1081+SB1081
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H01V0074+SB1081
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2314+SB1081
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0515SB1081+SB1081

Bill Comments

feedback