VA SB1062 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices. Provides that it is an unlawful discriminatory housing practice for any political jurisdiction or its employees or appointed commissions to discriminate in the application of local land use ordinances or guidelines, or in the permitting of housing developments, on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, elderliness, familial status, handicap, or because the housing development contains or is expected to contain affordable housing units occupied or intended for occupancy by families or individuals with incomes at or below 80 percent of the median income of the area where the housing development is located or is proposed to be located. The bill also requires the Fair Housing Board, after consultation with the Attorney General, instead of issuing a charge for a violation, to immediately refer the matter to the Attorney General for civil action in the appropriate circuit court for appropriate relief. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19100519D-E |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1062E |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Amendments by Senator McClellan agreed to |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) |
2018-12-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100519D |