VA SB106 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hydraulic fracturing; groundwater management area; prohibition. Prohibits hydraulic fracturing, as defined in the bill, in certain groundwater management areas.
Title
Hydraulic fracturing; drilling through any portion of a groundwater management area, prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 626 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB106ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House with amendments (61-Y 39-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20106341D-ES1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB106ES1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Surovell agreed to |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106341D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106341D-S1 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) |
2019-12-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-12-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101022D |