VA SB1058 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Air emissions; repeal of laws and regulations related to the Clean Air Interstate Rule. Repeals air emissions laws and regulations related to the federal Clean Air Interstate Rule upon the earlier of (i) the date when facilities in the Commonwealth become subject to the requirements of a federal implementation plan adopted by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency in response to the remand of the Clean Air Interstate Rule or (ii) the effective date of a final rule adopted by the State Air Pollution Control Board implementing federal requirements adopted by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency in response to the remand of the Clean Air Interstate Rule. The bill requires that, in the event the State Air Pollution Control Board develops a final rule to implement federal requirements adopted by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency in response to the remand of the Clean Air Interstate Rule, the State Air Pollution Control Board shall evaluate the inclusion of a renewable and energy-efficiency source set-aside as part of a new source set-aside when developing such rule.
Title
Air emissions; repeal of laws and regulations related to Clean Air Interstate Rule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 291 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1058ER) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103414D-E | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1058E | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103414D |