VA SB1055 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0075)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0075)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conveyance of easement. Authorizes the Department of Conservation and Recreation to grant and convey an easement and right-of-way at High Bridge Trail State Park to Woodrow R. Jackson, Sr. The easement, which will follow an existing driveway across a portion of the High Bridge Trail State Park, will allow ingress and egress from U.S. Highway 460 to the grantee's property.
Title
High Bridge Trail State Park; conveyance of easement to Woodrow R. Jackson, Sr.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0075) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 75 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1055ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101279D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1662 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074)
HB1662 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074)
HB1662 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074)
Subjects
Easements
High Bridge Trail State Park
Jackson Woodrow R. Sr.
Property and Conveyances
Uncodified Legislation
High Bridge Trail State Park
Jackson Woodrow R. Sr.
Property and Conveyances
Uncodified Legislation