VA SB1053 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil commitment proceedings; fees and compensation. Increases from $25 to $75 the fee paid to court-appointed counsel representing a person in a civil commitment proceeding under Title 19.2 of the Code of Virginia. The bill also provides that court-appointed counsel representing a person acquitted of a felony by reason of insanity in a hearing to assess the need for inpatient hospitalization shall be paid a fee not to exceed $445. This bill is a recommendation of the Judicial Council of Virginia. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a 2015 general appropriation act.
Title
Civil commitment proceedings; fees and compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15102140D-E |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1053E |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102140D |