VA SB1043 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Civil actions filed on behalf of multiple persons. Provides that a circuit court may enter an order joining, coordinating, consolidating, or transferring civil actions upon finding that separate civil actions brought by a plaintiff on behalf of multiple similarly situated persons involve common questions of law or fact and arise out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences. Under current law, such order is permitted only where six or more plaintiffs have filed such actions. The bill further requires the Supreme Court to promulgate rules no later than November 1, 2020, governing such actions. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.
Title
Civil actions; filed on behalf of multiple persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N) (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1043S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107611D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107611D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20100332D |