VA SB1038 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Non-conventional vehicles. Provides for the titling and registration of mopeds and distinctive license plates for low-speed vehicles. The bill also requires a moped operator to carry government-issued photo identification and wear a face shield, safety glasses, or goggles if his moped is not equipped with safety glass or a windshield. The bill also makes all-terrain vehicles, off-road motorcycles, and mopeds subject to the motor vehicle sales and use tax, if the owner does not show that they already paid the retail sales and use tax. The bill further classifies mopeds for valuation purposes in personal property taxation and allows localities to exempt mopeds from personal property taxation. The bill also replaces the term "scooter" with "foot-scooter" and makes other largely technical changes based upon recommendations made by DMV after a year-long study of Virginia's laws relating to non-conventional vehicles.
Title
Non-conventional vehicles; titling and registration of mopeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 783 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1038ER2) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 31-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (67-Y 31-N) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1038ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Title replaced 13105071D-H1 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 39-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute (60-Y 39-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1038H1 |
2013-02-13 | House | Pending question ordered |
2013-02-13 | House | Motion to refer to Finance committee rejected |
2013-02-13 | House | Amendments by Delegate Cole rejected |
2013-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13105071D-H1 |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed by motion rejected |
2013-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (93-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed (93-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 13105071D-H1 |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1038S1 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13103725D-S1 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Incorporates SB1067 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13103725D-S1 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101884D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1067 (Similar To) 2013-01-23 - Incorporated by Transportation