VA SB1030 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases. Adds cancers of the colon, brain, or testes to the list of cancers that are presumed to be an occupational disease covered by the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act when firefighters and certain employees develop the cancer. The measure will become effective if reenacted by the 2020 Session of the General Assembly. The measure also directs the 2020 Session of the General Assembly, in considering and enacting any legislation relating to workers' compensation and the presumption of compensability for certain cancers, to consider any research, findings, and recommendations from the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission's review of the Virginia Workers' Compensation program. The provisions of this bill do not become effective unless reenacted by the 2020 Session of the General Assembly. The bill incorporates SB 1022, SB 1172, and SB 1528 and is identical to HB 1804.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases, review of program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)
2019-02-15 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 26 (effective - see bill)
2019-02-08 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 15, 2019
2019-02-08SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 8, 2019
2019-02-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-07SenateSigned by President
2019-02-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1030ER)
2019-02-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-06SenateTitle replaced 19106367D-H1
2019-02-06SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1030H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106367D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead third time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106367D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1030S1
2019-01-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19104842D-S1
2019-01-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-24SenateRead second time
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
2019-01-14SenateIncorporates SB1528 (Vogel)
2019-01-14SenateIncorporates SB1172 (McPike)
2019-01-14SenateIncorporates SB1022 (Chase)
2019-01-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 19104842D-S1
2019-01-14SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-10-30SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-10-30SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100983D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652402(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1030
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1030+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1030S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1030H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1030ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0026+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0029+SB1030
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0068+SB1030
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1030+SB1030
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0183SB1030+SB1030
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0048+SB1030
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2133+SB1030
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0457SB1030+SB1030

Bill Comments

feedback