VA SB1025 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Net energy metering; standby charges. Requires the State Corporation Commission, when determining whether to approve a utility's proposed standby charge methodology, to find that the cost and benefit components used to calculate the proposed standby charges are based on load research on the affected class of eligible customer-generators and that the number of eligible customer-generators used in such load research is sufficient to form reasonable statistical conclusions about such costs and benefits. In addition, the standby charges collected from eligible customer-generators shall allow the supplier to recover only the portion of the supplier's net costs that are properly associated with serving eligible customer-generators. The measure also requires the Commission to review standby charges approved prior to July 1, 2013, for conformance with these new requirements for standby charge approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Net energy metering; standby charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-28SenatePassed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
2013-01-23SenateAssigned C&L sub: Electric Utility
2013-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2013-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103439D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback