VA SB1016 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bedding and upholstered furniture; exemption from regulation. Exempts from the Board of Health regulations governing bedding and upholstered furniture any items of bedding or upholstered furniture that are 75 years old or older.
Title
Bedding and upholstered furniture; exemption from regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 375 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1016ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2023-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100989D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2173 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
HB2173 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
HB2173 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)