VA SB1015 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prostitution; solicitation of a minor; penalty. Provides that, in addition to the current Class 1 misdemeanor punishment for solicitation of prostitution generally, any person who solicits prostitution from a minor (i) 16 years of age or older is guilty of a Class 6 felony or (ii) younger than 16 years of age is guilty of a Class 5 felony.
Title
Prostitution; solicitation of a minor, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 467 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1015ER) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended SB1015 |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13103293D-E |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1015E |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103293D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1606 (Same As) 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0417)