VA SB1001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0215)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0215)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fort Monroe Authority Board of Trustees; membership; terms. Adds three nonlegislative citizen members to the Fort Monroe Authority Board of Trustees, to be appointed by the Governor. The bill also changes the Secretary of Commerce and Trade and the Secretary of Natural Resources from voting to nonvoting ex officio members and removes the Lieutenant Governor from membership. This bill is identical to HB 2356.
Title
Fort Monroe Authority; increases number of members on Board of Trustees.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0215) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 215 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1001ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title replaced 17105246D-H1 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1001H1 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105246D-H1 |
2017-02-10 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105246D-H1 |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101431D |