VA HR1 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Bill text as passed House (HR1ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Bill text as passed House (HR1ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Sally Lamb.
Title
Celebrating the life of Sally Lamb.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Bill text as passed House (HR1ER) |
2022-01-31 | House | Agreed to by House |
2022-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/12/22 22100310D |