VA HJR98 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ98ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ98ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
First Lady Edith Bolling Wilson Day. Designates October 15, in 2012 and in each succeeding year, as First Lady Edith Bolling Wilson Day in Virginia.
Title
First Lady Edith Bolling Wilson Day; designating as October 15, 2012, and each succeeding year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ98ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2012-02-03 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Agreed to by House (92-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ98H1 | |
2012-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104974D-H1 | |
2012-02-03 | House: Taken up | |
2012-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104974D-H1 | |
2012-01-31 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103244D |