VA HJR974 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 55-33)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ974ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 55-33)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ974ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Senior Chief Petty Officer Scott C. Dayton.
Title
Celebrating the life of Senior Chief Petty Officer Scott C. Dayton.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ974ER) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-02-15 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17105330D |