VA HJR959 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ959ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ959ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Betty Van Yahres.
Title
Celebrating the life of Betty Van Yahres.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Del. William Howell [R] |
Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Del. Edward Scott [R] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Del. David Toscano [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. Rob Krupicka [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. Michael Futrell [D] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ959ER) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-25 | House | Agreed to by House |
2015-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-23 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15105219D |