VA HJR954 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ954ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ954ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of William W. Stanton VI.
Title
Celebrating the life of William W. Stanton VI.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ954ER) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-25 | House | Agreed to by House |
2015-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-23 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15105347D |