VA HJR939 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ939ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ939ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Craig M. MacLean.
Title
Commending Craig M. MacLean.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. Michael Futrell [D] | Del. Terry Austin [R] |
Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ939ER) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-25 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-23 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15105201D |