VA HJR92 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; establishes a joint subcommittee to study ways to increase college graduates with science, technology, engineering, and mathematics related baccalaureate degrees; report. In conducting its study, the joint subcommittee shall: (i) review current statistics on the number of STEM-related degrees awarded annually at higher education institutions in Virginia; (ii) explore the creation of individual income tax incentives; (iii) identify impediments to STEM education; (iv) review existing and successful Virginia Community College programs; (v) consider future industry needs in STEM fields; and (vi) examine ways to encourage partnerships between STEM-related departments at institutions of higher education and science and technology based businesses in the Commonwealth.
Title
College graduates; joint subcommittee to study ways to increase certain baccalaureate degrees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Rules | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103353D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HJ92 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HJ92+hil |