VA HJR874 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on February 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ874ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on February 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ874ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Honorable Leslie M. Alden.
Title
Commending the Honorable Leslie M. Alden.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ874ER) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Received |
2013-02-15 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2013-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 13104767D |
2013-02-12 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 13104767D |