VA HJR872 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ872ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ872ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Gerald W. Hyland.
Title
Commending Gerald W. Hyland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ872ER) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-23 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-19 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15104703D |