VA HJR86 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; development of a strategic plan for regional solid waste disposal in Southwest Virginia; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to conduct a one-year study of solid waste disposal in Southwest Virginia and the possible establishment of a regional solid waste disposal authority and regional landfill. Study; JLARC; development of a strategic plan for regional solid waste disposal in Southwest Virginia; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to conduct a one-year study of solid waste disposal in Southwest Virginia and the possible establishment of a regional solid waste disposal authority and regional landfill.
Title
Southwest Va.; JLARC to study development of strategic plan for regional solid waste disposal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Rules |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104353D |
Subjects
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Southwest Virginia
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Waste Disposal
Southwest Virginia
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Waste Disposal