VA HJR838 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ838ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Senior Officer Joseph M. Nichols.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Senior Officer Joseph M. Nichols.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ838ER)
2019-02-14SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-02-12SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2019-02-12SenateReceived
2019-02-11HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House
2019-02-06HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 19105325D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback