VA HJR829 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-30)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ829ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-30)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ829ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the James Madison University football team.
Title
Commending the James Madison University football team.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ829ER) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received |
2017-01-27 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-25 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17104336D |