VA HJR828 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ828ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ828ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Marion High School girls' volleyball team.
Title
Commending the Marion High School girls' volleyball team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ828ER) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received |
2017-01-27 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-25 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17101455D |