VA HJR797 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ797ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ797ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Mayflowers.
Title
Commending Mayflowers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ797ER) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received |
2013-02-01 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2013-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 13103336D |
2013-01-30 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 13103336D |