VA HJR78 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution; encouraging employers in the Commonwealth to pay their employees a living wage. Encourages employers in the Commonwealth to pay their employees a living wage. The resolution notes that the Massachusetts Institute of Technology has set up an online calculator that allows the living wage to be determined for various localities and metropolitan statistical areas in the Commonwealth.
Title
Resolution; encouraging employers in the Commonwealth to pay their employees a living wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Special Subcommittee |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103470D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HJ78 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HJ78+hil |