VA HJR772 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ772ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ772ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Braxton-Perkins American Legion Post 25.
Title
Commending Braxton-Perkins American Legion Post 25.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ772ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-01-31 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19103539D |