VA HJR727 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Passed on January 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-17 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ727ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Passed on January 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-17 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ727ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Dr. Toney Lee McNair, Jr.
Title
Commending Dr. Toney Lee McNair, Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ727ER) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Received |
2017-01-13 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-13 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2017-01-12 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17102248D |