VA HJR707 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Governor; 2018-2020 proposed budget; access to full array of programs, services, and benefits available under Medicaid. Encourages the Governor to include in his 2018-2020 proposed budget such language and amounts necessary to ensure access to the full array of programs, services, and benefits available under the federal Medicaid program.
Title
Governor; 2018-2020 proposed budget; access to array of programs, services,& benefits; Medicaid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103304D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HJ707 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HJ707+hil |