VA HJR701 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ701ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ701ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Stephen L. Oesch.
Title
Commending Stephen L. Oesch.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ701ER) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Received | |
2011-01-21 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-01-19 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 11103446D | |
2011-01-17 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 11103446D |