VA HJR691 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-17 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ691ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-17 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ691ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the cricket leagues of Virginia.
Title
Commending the cricket leagues of Virginia.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ691ER) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Received |
2013-01-11 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Engrossed by House |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 13103139D |
2013-01-09 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 13103139D |