VA HJR690 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Federal ethanol mandates for gasoline. Memorializes the Congress of the United States to repeal federal laws and regulations mandating that gasoline sold in the United States contain ethanol.
Title
Gasoline; Congress of United States urged to repeal federal ethanol mandates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2013-02-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 2-N 2-A) |
2013-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House (90-Y 2-N 2-A) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2013-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13102031D |