VA HJR69 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ69ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ69ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Sandra Gioia Treadway.
Title
Commending Sandra Gioia Treadway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ69ER) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Received |
2024-01-22 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-01-15 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24100322D |
Same As/Similar To
HR13 (Similar To) 2024-01-15 - Bill text as passed House (HR13ER)
SJR67 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ67ER)
SJR67 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ67ER)