VA HJR679 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); Governor's term of office. Permits a Governor elected in 2017 and thereafter to succeed himself in office. The amendment allows two four-year terms (either in succession or not in succession) but prohibits election to a third term. Service for more than two years of a partial term counts as service for one term.
Title
Constitutional amendment; Governor's term of office (first reference).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HJ549-Purkey) by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102263D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HJ679 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HJ679+hil |