VA HJR675 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; mitigation of the impact of tolls on Virginia's disadvantaged citizens; report. Establishes a joint subcommittee to study how Virginia can mitigate the impact of tolls on Virginia's disadvantaged citizens.
Title
Tolls; joint subcommittee to study how VA can mitigate impact on State's disadvantaged citizens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-16 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102363D |
Subjects
General Assembly
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Speaker of the House of Delegates
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Speaker of the House of Delegates
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HJ675 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HJ675+hil |