VA HJR669 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; mandatory renewable energy portfolio standard program; report. Directs the Commission on Electric Utility Regulation to study the establishment of a mandatory renewable energy portfolio standard program for the Commonwealth. The study will (i) address issues associated with transitioning from the existing voluntary renewable energy portfolio standard program to a mandatory program, (ii) determine the costs and benefits that would be associated with requiring electric utilities to meet varying levels of renewable energy portfolio standard goals, (iii) recommend measures to address electric utilities that do not meet the program's goals, and (iv) determine if it is feasible and advisable to require that all electric utilities in Virginia participate in a mandatory renewable energy portfolio standard program.
Title
Renewable energy; Commission on Electric Utility Regulation to study portfolio standard program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100944D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Public Service Companies
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
General Assembly
Public Service Companies
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HJ669 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HJ669+hil |