VA HJR665 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ665ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ665ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Western Branch High School track and field program.
Title
Commending the Western Branch High School track and field program.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ665ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received |
2019-01-14 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-01-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/19 19101718D |