VA HJR661 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Virginia State Crime Commission; costs of pretrial services; report. Directs the Virginia State Crime Commission to study the effects of changes in policies regarding the cash bail bond system on referrals to pretrial services agencies and costs associated with such referrals.
Title
Virginia State Crime Commission; costs of pretrial services, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103692D |