VA HJR654 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Opposing United Nations Agenda 21. Recognizes the need to oppose United Nations Agenda 21 due to its radical plan of purported "sustainable development." The resolution states that the General Assembly recognizes the policy's infringement on the American way of life and individual freedoms and ability to erode American sovereignty. The resolution would be transmitted to the U.S. Secretary of State, the Secretary-General of the United Nations, and the Virginia Congressional Delegation in order that they may be apprised of the sense of the General Assembly of Virginia in this matter during their deliberations.
Title
United Nations Agenda 21; General Assembly recognizes need to oppose.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Del. Keith Hodges [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 33-N) (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2013-02-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 33-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House (60-Y 33-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2013-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (10-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103255D |