VA HJR646 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; eliminate food deserts in Virginia; report. Requests the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to explore and recommend strategies to eliminate food deserts, which are areas devoid of access to affordable fruits, vegetables, whole grains, and other food products and staples necessary for a healthy diet. In conducting the study, the Secretary is also requested to examine ways to make healthy and affordable food products available and accessible to low-income and poor citizens and impoverished communities throughout the Commonwealth. The Secretary of Health and Human Resources must submit his findings and recommendations to the 2014 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Food deserts; SHHR to explore and recommend strategies to eliminate in State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-16 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101706D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HJ646 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HJ646+hil |