VA HJR645 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcohol and substance abuse on college campuses. Encourages the institutions of higher education in Virginia to heighten awareness of the perils of alcohol and substance abuse on college campuses. The resolution notes that parents and college officials must work collaboratively, concertedly, and decisively to educate college students concerning the dangers of alcohol and prescribed and controlled substance abuse.
Title
College campuses; higher educational institutions to heighten awareness of perils of alcohol abuse.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. James Scott [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Matthew James [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] |
Del. Rob Krupicka [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Reading waived |
2013-01-16 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Agreed to by House (93-Y 4-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Engrossed by House |
2013-01-16 | House | Taken up |
2013-01-14 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100307D |