VA HJR61 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Commission on Virginia's Transportation Needs; report. Establishes the Commission on Virginia's Transportation Needs to look at transportation needs in Virginia and alternatives for planning and financing Virginia's transportation system.
Title
Transportation Needs, Commission on; established, report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Rules | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101382D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HJ61 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HJ61+hil |