VA HJR609 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; composition of biosolids; report. Directs the Department of Environmental Quality to study the substances contained in biosolids generated from wastewater treatment facilities that are applied to lands for agricultural purposes. Report.
Title
Biosolids; DEQ to study substances contained in certain wastewater treatment facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2013-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101943D |
Subjects
Agriculture, Horticulture, and Food
Conservation
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Washington, D.C. Metropolitan Area
Conservation
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Washington, D.C. Metropolitan Area
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HJ609 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HJ609+hil |