VA HJR606 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR606
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Equal Citizens Month. Designates November, in 2021 and in each succeeding year, as Equal Citizens Month in Virginia.
Title
Equal Citizens Month; designating November, in 2021 and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-27 | House | Taken up |
2021-01-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103484D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR606 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)