VA HJR601 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); free elections, method of voting. Provides that all elections ought to be convenient to the voter and equally provided for throughout the Commonwealth, and that provision shall be made in all elections other than primary and special elections for votes to be cast starting at least 30 days before the general election date. Votes may be cast early in person, by mail, or by other means as provided by law without qualification.
Title
Constitutional amendment; free elections, method of voting (first reference).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee |
2013-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102080D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HJ601 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HJ601+hil |