VA HJR594 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ594ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ594ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Bureau of Insurance to study use of credit history in insurance underwriting; report. Requests the Bureau of Insurance to study the use by insurers of an insured's or applicant's credit information in connection with underwriting motor vehicle insurance policies.
Title
Insurance underwriting; Bureau of Insurance to study use of credit history.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ594ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading waived |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-09 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102199D |