VA HJR591 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); reapportionment; technical adjustments permitted. Gives the General Assembly the authority to make technical adjustments to legislative electoral district boundaries following the enactment of any decennial reapportionment law. Such adjustments may be made solely for the purpose of causing legislative electoral district boundaries to coincide with the boundaries of voting precincts established in the counties and cities and shall be permitted only to the extent necessary to accomplish this purpose. Any change made shall be consistent with any criteria for legislative electoral districts adopted for the preceding decennial redistricting.
Title
Constitutional amendment; reapportionment, technical adjustments permitted (first reference).
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820) | |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned Chapter 820 (effective 7/1/19) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ591ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 47-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House (51-Y 47-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-11-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101055D |